Global Patent Index - EP 1005808 A2

EP 1005808 A2 2000-06-07 - Container

Title (en)

Container

Title (de)

Behälter

Title (fr)

Conteneur

Publication

EP 1005808 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890370 A

Priority

AT 196998 A

Abstract (en)

The rucksack or satchel incorporating an elastically-deformable concave plate (11) on its side resting against the carrier's back is characterized by the following facts: a) the concave plate (11) has at least two elongate protrusions (23) located symmetrically about the vertical axis of the rucksack; b) these protrusions are provided with a cushioning element (22); c) the height of the protrusions preferably corresponds to the thickness of the cushioning elements.

Abstract (de)

Behälter, insbesondere Tasche oder Rucksack, mit Rücken-Traggurten (24), dessen am Rücken des Trägers zur Anlage kommende Wand mit einer durch eine in einem Vertikalschnitt im wesentlichen gekrümmt verlaufende Platte (1, 11) aus einem festen elastisch verformbaren Material gebildeten Aussteifung und einer Polsterung (22) versehen ist. Um den Tragekomfort zu erhöhen, ist vorgesehen, daß diese Platte (1) in Gebrauchslage des Behälters im Vertikalschnitt im wesentlichen konkav gekrümmt ist, sodaß der Behälter im wesentlichen lediglich im obersten und untersten Bereich am Rücken eines Trägers anliegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45F 3/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005808 A2 20000607; EP 1005808 A8 20010328; AT 406997 B 20001127; AT A196998 A 20000415

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-29 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1031184

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-04-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-11-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-10-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 45F 3/04 A, 7A 45F 3/08 B

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEORG ESSL RUCKSACK- UND TASCHENFABRIK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ESSL, GEORG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI