Global Patent Index - EP 1005808 A8

EP 1005808 A8 2001-03-28 - Container

Title (en)

Container

Title (de)

Behälter

Title (fr)

Conteneur

Publication

EP 1005808 A8 (DE)

Application

EP 99890370 A

Priority

AT 196998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1005808A2] The rucksack or satchel incorporating an elastically-deformable concave plate (11) on its side resting against the carrier's back is characterized by the following facts: a) the concave plate (11) has at least two elongate protrusions (23) located symmetrically about the vertical axis of the rucksack; b) these protrusions are provided with a cushioning element (22); c) the height of the protrusions preferably corresponds to the thickness of the cushioning elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45F 3/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005808 A2 20000607; EP 1005808 A3 20020116; EP 1005808 A8 20010328; AT 406997 B 20001127; AT A196998 A 20000415

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-29 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1031184

2003-04-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-11-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 45F 3/04 A, 7A 45F 3/08 B

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEORG ESSL RUCKSACK- UND TASCHENFABRIK GMBH

2001-03-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ESSL, GEORG

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI