Global Patent Index - EP 1005812 A3

EP 1005812 A3 2000-06-14 - Active dynamic seat

Title (en)

Active dynamic seat

Title (de)

Aktiv-dynamische Sitzvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Siège dynamico-actif

Publication

EP 1005812 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00102876 A

Priority

  • DE 19533558 A
  • DE 29516794 U
  • EP 96114568 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761136A1] The curved basic surface (1A) is spherically curved at least partially. A seat squab (2) is inclinable mounted, tilting to all sides, on a support point (3A). The support point lies either underneath the curvature centre point of the basic surface or is adjustable within a height range, the lower limit of which is located beneath the curvature centre point and its upper limit lies beneath the curvature centre point or coincides with it. On the seat part a connecting component (4) is fitted, which locates on a support. The connecting component is formed as an elastically sprung or bendable part, e.g. as a rubber plate. The support is a downwardly curved base, partic. a point, needle or dome, the highest point of which is the support point.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 3/02 (2006.01); A47C 3/029 (2006.01); A47C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 3/02 (2013.01); A47C 3/029 (2013.01); A47C 9/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0761136 A1 19970312; EP 0761136 B1 20001129; AT 197756 T 20001215; DE 19533558 C1 19961107; DE 29516794 U1 19951207; DE 59606162 D1 20010104; DE 59610429 D1 20030612; EP 1005812 A2 20000607; EP 1005812 A3 20000614; EP 1005812 B1 20030507; ES 2153926 T3 20010316

INPADOC legal status


2016-09-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59610429

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151106

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-05-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-11-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-08-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030818

2003-08-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-08-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610429 P 20030612

2003-05-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0761136 P

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB NL SE

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-05-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-05-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030507

2002-04-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB NL SE

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;SI

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000211

2000-06-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 761136

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB NL SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;SI