Global Patent Index - EP 1005815 A3

EP 1005815 A3 2000-10-18 - Display apparatus

Title (en)

Display apparatus

Title (de)

Schaugestell

Title (fr)

Présentoir

Publication

EP 1005815 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00200714 A

Priority

  • EP 95305698 A
  • GB 9416505 A
  • GB 9512500 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1005815A2] The display apparatus 2 comprises a cascading display device 4 which defines three elongate channels 6, 8, 10 in which articles, for example magazines or newspapers, may be arranged and displayed. The display device 4 is supported by a support device 12 which extends between a rear wall 14, situated behind the device 4, and the display device and is arranged to support the display device against downwards movement. The support device includes a support flange 78 which extends into a gap defined between limbs 34, 36 of respective channels 6, 8. Support rods 16 extend between the wall 14 and the display device 4 and are arranged to space the display device 4 from the wall 14; to prevent the display device 4 from pivoting about the support device 12; and to add rigidity to the display apparatus. In another embodiment, a support device is provided which includes support flanges which extend into respective gaps defined between the first and second channels 6, 8 and the second and third channels 8, 10. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/145 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005815 A2 20000607; EP 1005815 A3 20001018; EP 1005815 B1 20061025; DE 69531932 D1 20031120; DE 69531932 T2 20040722; DE 69531932 T3 20091022; DE 69535280 D1 20061207; DE 69535280 T2 20070531

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150814

2015-09-09 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150814

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140723

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69535280

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120815

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120815

2013-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-05-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BARTUF SYSTEMS LTD

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-03-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120301

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110823

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110624

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20110616

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101028

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100914

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100831

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-10-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070726

2007-05-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69535280 P 20061207

2006-11-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2006-10-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0726047 P

2006-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE IT NL

2006-10-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-10-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BARTUF SYSTEMS LIMITED

2006-04-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DISPLAY APPARATUS AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLING A DISPLAY APPARATUS

2004-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040316

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IE IT NL

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE IT NL

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000327

2000-06-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 726047

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE IT NL