Global Patent Index - EP 1005816 A1

EP 1005816 A1 2000-06-07 - Flowerbox holder

Title (en)

Flowerbox holder

Title (de)

Blumenkastenhalter

Title (fr)

Support de jardinière

Publication

EP 1005816 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122364 A

Priority

DE 29821439 U

Abstract (en)

The holder (1) has at least one trough-shaped support (11) having a main side wall (13), and a hook (21) which grips the wall of a balcony. A folded section (31) of the holder enables the box to be gripped at the lip region of one of its side walls.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Halter (1) zur horizontalen Abstützung eines Blumenkastens (2) an einer Balkonwand (3) mit einem wannenförmig ausgebildeten Auflager (11) und einem die Balkonwand (3) teilweise umgreifenden Haken (21) ist an dem Haken (21) eine in Richtung des Blumenkastens (2) abstehendes und in dieses eingreifendes Ansatzstück (31) angebracht, durch das der Blumenkasten (29) im Zusammenwirken mit der Seitenwand (13) des Auflagers (11) arretiert ist. Durch diese Ausgestaltung wird erreicht, daß ein Blumenkasten (2) sicher an einer Balkonwand (3) zu arretieren ist, ohne daß die Gefahr besteht, daß der Blumenkasten (2) durch eine Verschiebebewegung oder durch Kippen von den Haltern (1) zu lösen ist. Der Blumenkasten (2) ist somit, ohne daß es eines zusätzlichen Bauaufwandes bedarf, betriebssicher in den Haltern (1) abzustützen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 7/044 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29821439 U1 20000413; EP 1005816 A1 20000607

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031014

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030401

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001118

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI