Global Patent Index - EP 1005817 A1

EP 1005817 A1 2000-06-07 - Decorative wooden container and method of making same

Title (en)

Decorative wooden container and method of making same

Title (de)

Decoratives Behältnis aus Holz und Methode zur Herstellung deselbigen

Title (fr)

Container décoratif en bois et méthode de fabrication

Publication

EP 1005817 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98250428 A

Priority

EP 98250428 A

Abstract (en)

A decorative wooden container comprising: a decorative outer frame (10) having a space portion (10a) with prescribed size; and an inner component (20) that can be rotated while being attached to the space portion of the decorative outer frame (10), the spiral of Archimedes is used to cut up an arc circle (20a) which constantly increases in size is configured on the inner component (20). If the inner component is positioned horizontally to said decorative outer frame (10), then a surface of the inner component and the decorative outer frame (10) form same plane surface to use as a decoration, and when the inner component (20) is positioned vertically to the decorative outer frame (10) then the center of the inner component (20) is positioned vertically to the decorative outer frame (10) then the center of the inner component drops down as a result of the arc circle (20a) to form a step like spiral wall so that a container is created to hold articles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 19/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 19/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 096, no. 005 31 May 1996 (1996-05-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005817 A1 20000607

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001208

2001-03-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI