Global Patent Index - EP 1005823 A1

EP 1005823 A1 2000-06-07 - Suction pipe element for a vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

Suction pipe element for a vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Saugrohrteil für einen Staubsauger

Title (fr)

Elément tubulaire d'aspiration pour un aspirateur

Publication

EP 1005823 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123599 A

Priority

DE 19855907 A

Abstract (en)

The vacuum cleaner suction tube part (1) has an additional vacuum tool (3) that can be brought into a working and a rest position as required. The tool is arranged near the suction side end of the suction tube part and can slide on the suction tube part. The tool is longitudinally divided, whereby the sections (3a,3b) of the tool so formed can held in the working position by an elastic element (7).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Saugrohrteil für einen Staubsauger, an dem ein zusätzliches Saugwerkzeug (3) derart gehaltert ist, daß es wahlweise in eine Arbeits- bzw. Ruhestellung bringbar ist. Das Anbringen eines zusätzlichen Saugwerkzeuges kann dadurch ohne ein gesondertes Halteteil erfolgen, daß das Saugwerkzeug (3) im Bereich des saugseitigen Endes (Ansaugöffnung 2) des Saugrohrteiles (1) verschiebbar auf dem Saugrohrteil (1) angeordnet ist,. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005823 A1 20000607; EP 1005823 B1 20030813; DE 19855907 A1 20000608

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59906576

- Effective date: 20150402

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091126

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091126

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906576 P 20030918

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHOEPPNER, SYLVIA

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHROETER, JOERG

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EYRING, STEFAN

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JESSENBERGER, MARTIN

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RAEDER, SEBASTIAN

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KESS, HERBERT

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BUETTNER, MARIA

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020320

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001120

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI