Global Patent Index - EP 1005825 A1

EP 1005825 A1 2000-06-07 - VACUUM CLEANER

Title (en)

VACUUM CLEANER

Title (de)

Staubsauger

Title (fr)

ASPIRATEUR

Publication

EP 1005825 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99121905 A

Priority

DE 19855906 A

Abstract (en)

The vacuum cleaner has a removable dust collection container (4) mounted in the vacuum cleaner housing for extracting the dirt separated from the suction air flow with an inlet (9) and an outlet (16) connected to the vacuum cleaner's fan assembly (5). A flat filter (10) is arranged in the dust collection container in the flow path between the inlet and outlet openings.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Staubsauger, mit einem herausnehmbar am Staubsaugergehäuse angeordneten, den aus dem Saugluftstrom ausgeschiedenen Schmutz aufnehmenden Staubsammelbehälte(4) , der eine strömungsmäßig mit dem Gebläseaggregat (5) des Staubssaugers verbundene Ein- und Auslaßöffnung (9 und 16) aufweist, wobei in dem zwischen der Ein- und Auslaßöffnung (9 und 16) verlaufenden Strömungsweg mindestens ein Filter (10) angeordnet ist. Eine längere Filterstandzeit durch fortwährendes Reinigen des Filters wird daurch erreicht, daß zumindest ein Teilbereich (17) des Filters (10) der Einlaßöffnung (9) direkt gegenüberliegend angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005825 A1 20000607; DE 19855906 A1 20000608; HU 9904468 A2 20000928; HU 9904468 A3 20020528; HU 9904468 D0 20000228

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060601

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020321

2001-05-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001120

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI