Global patent index - EP 1005848 A3

EP 1005848 A3 2000-09-13 - Thermal container, particularly feeding bottle

Title (en)

Thermal container, particularly feeding bottle

Title (de)

Wärmeisolierender Behälter insbesondere Saugflasche

Title (fr)

Récipient isotherme, en particulier biberon

Publication

EP 1005848 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99123199 A

Priority

IT PS980020 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1005848A2] A thermal container, particularly a feeding bottle, comprising a bottle (2) provided with an externally threaded neck (3) which forms a mouth (5), a teat (7) provided with an annular portion (6) which is arranged on the mouth (5) and a ring which is screwed onto the neck (3) so as to hermetically secure the annular portion on the mouth, the ring (9) having a flange (10) with which an enclosure (13) is associated, the enclosure defining, together with the bottle, an interspace (14) for thermal insulation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 9/08; B65D 81/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 9/00 (2006.01); A61J 9/08 (2006.01); A61J 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 9/003 (2013.01); A61J 9/08 (2013.01); A61J 11/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005848 A2 20000607; EP 1005848 A3 20000913; IT PS980020 A1 20000530; IT PS980020 D0 19981130

INPADOC legal status

2002-01-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-07-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI