Global Patent Index - EP 1005883 A1

EP 1005883 A1 2000-06-07 - Snowsport device

Title (en)

Snowsport device

Title (de)

Schneesportgerät

Title (fr)

Ensemble de glisse sur neige

Publication

EP 1005883 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420236 A

Priority

  • FR 9815500 A
  • FR 9901952 A
  • FR 9903908 A
  • FR 9911903 A

Abstract (en)

The snowboard is provided with a central cavity (102) defining two longitudinal side beams (103,104). Anchoring points (107,108) are arranged in these side beams in which an intermediate plate (106) for the front and rear feet is fixed (107,108). The intermediate plate is provided in its central support zone overhanging the cavity with anchoring means (109) for fixing the corresponding boot.

Abstract (fr)

Ensemble de glisse sur neige comprenant un surf des neiges et un système de fixation des chaussures du surfeur. Le surf est pourvu d'un conséquent évidement central (102) définissant deux longerons latéraux longitudinaux (103, 104), placés directement de part et d'autre de l'évidement (102). Les points d'ancrage (107, 108) sont ménagés dans ces deux longerons latéraux longitudinaux (103, 104). Pour le pied avant comme pour le pied arrière, une plaque intermédiaire respective (106) se fixe (107, 108) dans ces points d'ancrage. Cette plaque intermédiaire (106) est munie, dans sa zone centrale surplombant l'évidement (102), de moyens (109) d'ancrage de la fixation de la chaussure correspondante. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 5/03; A63C 5/04; A63C 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/00 (2006.01); A63C 5/03 (2006.01); A63C 5/04 (2006.01); A63C 10/00 (2012.01); A63C 10/14 (2012.01); A63C 10/18 (2012.01); A63C 10/20 (2012.01); A63C 10/28 (2012.01); A63C 10/04 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/003 (2013.01); A63C 5/03 (2013.01); A63C 5/0405 (2013.01); A63C 5/126 (2013.01); A63C 10/005 (2013.01); A63C 10/14 (2013.01); A63C 10/18 (2013.01); A63C 10/20 (2013.01); A63C 10/28 (2013.01); A63C 10/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005883 A1 20000607; EP 1005883 B1 20040616; AT 269128 T 20040715; DE 69918039 D1 20040722; DE 69918039 T2 20041014; US 6102428 A 20000815

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131224

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061203

2006-12-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061211

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-17 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051117

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050317

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69918039 P 20040722

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001111

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI