Global Patent Index - EP 1005888 A1

EP 1005888 A1 2000-06-07 - Rinsing system for removing residues

Title (en)

Rinsing system for removing residues

Title (de)

Spülvorrichtung zur Entfernung von Rückständen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de rinçage pour enlever des résidus

Publication

EP 1005888 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123942 A

Priority

DE 19855910 A

Abstract (en)

The rinsing apparatus for removing residue from the sump run-off of an evaporator comprises (a) a run-off container (7), (b) a collector container (8), (c) a run-off valve (10), (d) a rinsing water valve (11), (e) run-off container valve (12), (f) rinsing run-off valve (13), (g) vent valve (14), (h) a delivery pipe (17) from the sump to the run-off valve (10), (i) a inlet pipe (3) for the rinsing agent, (j) a run-off pipe device (6,16) and a connector to the devices (a) to (j). An Independent claim is included for the use of a rinsing apparatus.

Abstract (de)

Spülvorrichtung zur Entfernung von Rückständen aus dem Sumpfablauf eines Kopfprodukt und Sumpfprodukt erzeugenden, mit einem Sumpfablauf ausgestatteten Verdampfungsapparates, enthaltend: a) einen Ablaufbehälter (7), b) einen Sammelbehälter (8), c) ein Ablaufventil (10), d) ein Spülwasserventil (11), e) ein Behälterablaufventil (12), f) ein Spülablaufventil (13), g) ein Entlüftungsventil (14), h) eine aus dem Sumpf zum Ablaufventil (10) führende Leitung (17), i) ein Einleitungsrohr (3) für Spülmittel, j) eine Ablaufleitungs-Einrichtung (6, 16) und Verbindungsleitungen zwischen den Einrichtungen a) bis j). Die Spülvorrichtung kann bei der destillativen Aufarbeitung salzhaltiger Lösungen verwendet werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 3/00; B08B 9/093

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 1/22 (2006.01); B08B 3/08 (2006.01); B08B 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005888 A1 20000607; EP 1005888 B1 20050914; AT 304395 T 20050915; CN 1216697 C 20050831; CN 1260248 A 20000719; DE 19855910 A1 20000608; DE 59912551 D1 20051020; JP 2000197862 A 20000718; US 6443170 B1 20020903

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-08-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060615

2006-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-03 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-02-14 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060214

2006-01-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-12-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051225

2005-12-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2005-12-14 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-12-14 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-12-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051203

2005-12-03 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051203

2005-10-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912551 P 20051020

2005-10-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-09-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-09-14 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020515

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI