Global Patent Index - EP 1005901 A2

EP 1005901 A2 2000-06-07 - Method and device for mixing components for bone cement in a mixing vessel

Title (en)

Method and device for mixing components for bone cement in a mixing vessel

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Mischen von Bestandteilen für Knochenzement in einer Mischvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour mélanger des composants pour un ciment osseux dans un récipient de mélange

Publication

EP 1005901 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00101315 A

Priority

  • EP 96939409 A
  • US 54559195 A
  • US 73481796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9718031A1] A method and an arrangement for successively feeding batches into a mixing vessel (2) under partial vacuum for the preparation of bone cement. The mixing vessel is pre-filled with a powder component (B) of said bone cement. A container containing a liquid bone cement (A) is connectable to the tubular rod (6b) of an agitator for mixing components (A, B) so that component (A) can be introduced into the mixing vessel by means of the vacuum present in said vessel. During mixing the agitator rod (6b) is sealed by a removable tightening rod. When mixing is completed tightening rod is removed from said tubular rod (6b) which now will serve as a spout for the bone cement. The bottom of the mixing vessel is movable and serves as a piston for emptying the mixing vessel through the spout.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 13/00; A61F 2/46; B01F 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/46 (2006.01); B01F 13/00 (2006.01); B01F 13/06 (2006.01); B01F 15/02 (2006.01); A61F 2/00 (2006.01); B01F 3/12 (2006.01); B01F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 15/0205 (2013.01); B01F 13/002 (2013.01); B01F 13/06 (2013.01); B01F 15/0206 (2013.01); B01F 15/0208 (2013.01); B01F 15/0223 (2013.01); B01F 15/0234 (2013.01); B01F 15/0258 (2013.01); B01F 15/0278 (2013.01); A61B 17/8827 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30561 (2013.01); A61F 2002/4685 (2013.01); A61F 2250/0071 (2013.01); B01F 11/0082 (2013.01); B01F 15/0266 (2013.01); B01F 2003/1257 (2013.01); B01F 2215/0029 (2013.01); B01F 2215/0037 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9718031 A1 19970522; AU 7659896 A 19970605; DE 69614133 D1 20010830; DE 69614133 T2 20020314; DE 69634704 D1 20050609; DE 69634704 T2 20060316; DK 0861117 T3 20011022; DK 1005900 T3 20050829; EP 0861117 A1 19980902; EP 0861117 B1 20010725; EP 1005900 A2 20000607; EP 1005900 A3 20021009; EP 1005900 B1 20050504; EP 1005901 A2 20000607; EP 1005901 A3 20021009; EP 1016452 A2 20000705; EP 1016452 A3 20021009

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030820

2003-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000201

2000-06-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 861117

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT NL SE