Global Patent Index - EP 1005913 A2

EP 1005913 A2 2000-06-07 - Spacer for electrical, specially electrostatic, filter

Title (en)

Spacer for electrical, specially electrostatic, filter

Title (de)

Distanzhalter für einen elektrischen, insbesondere einen elektrostatischen Filter

Title (fr)

Isolateur pour filtre électrique, en particulier électrostatique

Publication

EP 1005913 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121462 A

Priority

DE 19855044 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19855044C1] The distance piece has a base body (2) made of an insulating material, or coated with an insulating material, that holds the elements of the filter to be spatially separated at a distance apart. The base body has a pointed arch shape (10a,10b), at least in one of its two sub-regions (8a,8b).

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird ein Distanzhalter für einen elektrischen, insbesondere einen elektrostatischen Filter, der einen aus einem isolierenden Material bestehenden oder mit einem derartigen Material beschichteten Grundkörper (2) aufweist, durch den räumlich zu separierende Elemente des Filters auf Distanz haltbar sind. Erfindungsgemäß ist vorgesehen, daß der Grundkörper (2) zumindest in einem seiner beiden Teilbereiche (8a,8b) eine spitzbogenförmige Form aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B03C 3/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B03C 3/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B03C 3/70 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19855044 C1 19991230; EP 1005913 A2 20000607; EP 1005913 A3 20001122

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-03-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: SPACER FOR ELECTRICAL, SPECIALLY ELECTROSTATIC, FILTER

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030610

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010521

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 03C 3/70 A, 7B 03C 3/36 B

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI