Global Patent Index - EP 1005923 A1

EP 1005923 A1 2000-06-07 - Rolling mill provided with means for bending the work rolls

Title (en)

Rolling mill provided with means for bending the work rolls

Title (de)

Walzwerk mit Mitteln zur Biegung der Arbeitswalzen

Title (fr)

Laminoir équipé de moyens de cambrage des cylindres de travail

Publication

EP 1005923 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402958 A

Priority

FR 9815077 A

Abstract (en)

A rolling mill comprises respectively positive (5,5') and negative (6,6') cambering rams supported on lugs (7,7') of chocks (4,4') of the two working cylinders. Each lug of a chock (4) has a staged section comprising at least one support part (73) and a clearance (74). The negative cambering rams (6) of a first chock (4) are arranged on the same side of the rolling plane (P1) than the positive cambering rams (5') of the second chock (4') crossing the rolling plane through the clearance (74). The chocks of the two working cylinders are similar and can be mounted on either cylinders (2,2').

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a pour objet un laminoir comprenant des vérins de cambrage, respectivement positif (5, 5') et négatif (6, 6') prenant appui sur des oreilles (7, 7') des empoises (4,4') des deux cylindres de travail (2, 2'). Selon l'invention, chaque oreille (7) d'une empoise (4) présente un profil étagé comprenant au moins une partie d'appui (73) et un espace libre (74) et les vérins (6) de cambrage négatif d'une première empoise (4) sont montés du même côté du plan de laminage (P1) que les vérins (5') de cambrage positif de la seconde empoise (4') qui traversent le plan de laminage (P1), en passant dans un espace libre (74), les empoises des deux cylindres de travail (2, 2') étant identiques et pouvant, par simple retournement, être montées sur l'un ou l'autre desdits cylindres (2, 2'). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 29/00 (2006.01); B21B 31/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 29/00 (2013.01); B21B 31/203 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] GB 2263876 A 19930811 - ACHENBACH BUSCHHUETTEN GMBH [DE]
  • [A] EP 0286533 A1 19881012 - CLECIM SA [FR]
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 170 (M - 817) 21 April 1989 (1989-04-21)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 005 (M - 267) 11 January 1984 (1984-01-11)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 045 (M - 1077) 4 February 1991 (1991-02-04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005923 A1 20000607; EP 1005923 B1 20030212; AT 232425 T 20030215; DE 69905332 D1 20030320; DE 69905332 T2 20031023; ES 2189366 T3 20030701; FR 2786415 A1 20000602; FR 2786415 B1 20010209; US 6244090 B1 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091127

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110314

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091126

2011-03-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110328

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090119

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081126

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081209

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KVAERNER METALS CLECIM

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051126

2005-11-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051126

2005-11-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051126

2005-11-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041124

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-10 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20041110

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2189366 T3

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69905332 P 20030320

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB IT

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020409

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES GB IT

2000-11-08 [16A] NEW DOCUMENTS DISCOVERED AFTER COMPLETION OF THE EP-SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000610

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB IT

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI