Global patent index - EP 1005927 A2

EP 1005927 A2 2000-06-07 - Method and device for the threading of tubes in a drawing machine

Title (en)

Method and device for the threading of tubes in a drawing machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Arbeitsverfahren zum Einfädeln von Rohren in eine Ziehmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour l'enfilage de tuyaux dans une machine d'étirage

Publication

EP 1005927 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99250412 A

Priority

DE 19856479 A

Abstract (en)

Tube or rod (1) insertion equipment, comprises a clamping sleeve (6) fitted on the workpiece leading end tip and engaged by clamping jaws (10) of drawing machine crawler tracks. Tube or rod (1) insertion equipment, for a drawing assembly with circulating chain pairs having clamping jaws for gripping the outer periphery of the workpiece and for continuously pulling the workpiece through a drawing die (3), comprises a removable gripping device (5) in the form of a clamping sleeve (6) pushed onto a drawing tip (2) formed at the tube or rod leading end. The clamping sleeve has several internal clamping elements (7), which automatically engage the tip periphery in the drawing direction, and engages in the interspace between two adjacent clamping jaws (10) of each chain (9) for pulling by the clamping jaws. An Independent claim is also included for a method of inserting a tube or rod into a drawing assembly using the above apparatus.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Einfädeln von Rohren oder Stangen in ein Ziehaggregat mit umlaufenden Kettenpaaren, die das Werkstück mittels Klemmbacken am äußeren Umfang greifen und kontinuierlich durch einen dem Ziehaggregat zugeordneten, in einem Ziehringhalter angeordneten Ziehring ziehen, sowie mit einer aus der Ziehachse entfernbaren Greifvorrichtung zum Erfassen der am Rohr- oder Stangenanfang ausgebildeten Ziehangel und Führen des Rohranfanges in die Ziehvorrichtung. Dabei ist die Greifvorrichtung (5) als auf die Ziehangel (2) aufschiebbare Klemmhülse (6) ausgebildet, die in ihrem Inneren mehre an den Umfang der Ziehangel anlegbare, in Ziehrichtung selbstklemmende Spannelemente (7) aufnimmt und die in den zwischen zwei benachbarten Klemmbacken (10) jeder Kette (9) gebildeten Zwischenraum, die Klemmbacken (10) hintergreifend, einlegbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 1/16; B21C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 1/16 (2006.01); B21C 1/20 (2006.01); B21C 1/30 (2006.01); B21C 1/32 (2006.01); B21C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 5/00 (2013.01); B21C 1/16 (2013.01); B21C 1/20 (2013.01); B21C 1/30 (2013.01); B21C 1/32 (2013.01); B21C 5/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005927 A2 20000607; EP 1005927 A3 20010711; DE 19856479 A1 20000608

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20021029

2002-04-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR IT

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011105

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 21C 1/16 A, 7B 21C 5/00 B, 7B 21C 1/30 B, 7B 21C 1/32 B, 7B 21C 1/22 B, 7B 21C 1/28 B

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI