Global Patent Index - EP 1005931 A2

EP 1005931 A2 2000-06-07 -

Publication

EP 1005931 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99123709 A

Priority

JP 33869098 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a work piece processing system capable of classifying and accumulating machined products based on their objects, efficiently accumulating them in a limited area, and simply creating a relevant control programs. A work piece processing system comprises a work piece machining device 1, a transfer device 2, a control device 3, and an automatic programming device 4. The automatic programming device 4 generates a machining program 13 and a classification and accumulation program 15 based on product shape information 7a and classification information 9.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 43/00; B21D 43/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23Q 15/00 (2006.01); B21D 28/00 (2006.01); B21D 43/20 (2006.01); B21D 43/22 (2006.01); B23Q 41/08 (2006.01); B65G 57/03 (2006.01); B65H 29/00 (2006.01); G05B 15/02 (2006.01); G05B 19/418 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 43/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005931 A2 20000607; EP 1005931 A3 20020911; EP 1005931 B1 20040512; DE 69917191 D1 20040617; DE 69917191 T2 20050120; JP 2000158301 A 20000613; JP 3211789 B2 20010925

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69917191

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69917191

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN, DE

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69917191

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSA, DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121129

2012-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20111114

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69917191 P 20040617

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI

2003-12-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: WORK PIECE PROCESSING DEVICE

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030526

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI

2003-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030107

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21D 43/00 A, 7B 21D 43/20 B, 7B 21D 43/28 B

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI