Global patent index - EP 1005932 A2

EP 1005932 A2 2000-06-07 - Method and device for plastically forming a hollow cylinder with internal gear teeth

Title (en)

Method and device for plastically forming a hollow cylinder with internal gear teeth

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur plastischen Formgebung eines Hohlzylinders mit Innenverzahnung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la formation plastique d'un cylindre creux à denture intérieure

Publication

EP 1005932 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99106390 A

Priority

DE 19852261 A

Abstract (en)

Hollow cylinder with inner teeth is plastically formed by a device incorporating a press matrix and press die. The press matrix comprises a counter bearing (4) and ring-shaped cover (3) for accommodating a cylindrical blank (8) with central hole. The press die has a cylindrical pin (1b) and tooth-cutting tool (1a). The diameter of the pin corresponds to the inner diameter of the blank with a slight under-dimension. The tooth-cutting tool on its outer periphery is provided with the profile (6) of the desired inner teeth of the hollow cylinder. The counter bearing (4) has a cavity (7) for accommodation of the pin when the tooth cutting tool is moved completely inwards.

Abstract (de)

Um Rundkörper, insbesondere großer Dimensionen, spanlos umzuformen, wird ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung vorgeschlagen, wobei ein zylinderförmiger Rohling (8) mit Zentralbohrung in die Preßmatrize eingelegt wird, die einen ringförmigen Mantel (3) und ein Gegenlager (4) umfaßt, daß der Preßstempel (1), der aus einem vorgelagerten Zapfen (1b) und einem Verzahnungswerkzeug (1a), das an seinem Außenumfang mit dem Profil (6) der gewünschten Innenverzahnung versehen ist, besteht, auf den Rohling (8) aufgesetzt wird, daß zuerst der Zapfen (1b), dessen Durchmesser dem Innendurchmesser des Rohlings mit geringfügigem Untermaß entspricht, in den Rohling ohne Umformvorgang eintaucht und anschließend das Verzahnungswerkzeug (1a) in den Rohling eingepreßt wird und der Zapfen (1b) in eine Vertiefung (7) des Gegenlagers (4) eintaucht, wobei das Material des Rohlings entgegen der Druckrichtung fließt und aufgrund des voreilenden Zapfens (1b) eine Fließbewegung in den Hohlraum des Rohlings verhindert wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 5/12 (2006.01); B21K 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 5/12 (2013.01); B21K 1/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005932 A2 20000607; EP 1005932 A3 20010829

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-06-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 21J 5/12 A, 7B 21K 1/30 B

2000-07-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DIPL.-ING STAMM DETLEF

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI