Global Patent Index - EP 1005944 A2

EP 1005944 A2 2000-06-07 - Laser beam welding process for overlap seams on coated metal sheets

Title (en)

Laser beam welding process for overlap seams on coated metal sheets

Title (de)

Laserstrahl-Schweissverfahren für Überlappnähte an beschichteten Blechen

Title (fr)

Procédé de soudage au faisceau laser pour des joints par recouvrement de tôles revêtues

Publication

EP 1005944 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121819 A

Priority

DE 19854217 A

Abstract (en)

Laser beam lap welding of coated sheets (1,2), by processor-controlled positioning of a laser beam focal spot center (M) within an upper sheet radius region forming a gas venting space (4), is new. A laser beam lap welding process for coated sheets (1,2) comprises: (a) positioning the two sheets on top of one another at one side of the lap seam (3) and slightly spaced apart as a result of an upper sheet radius on the other side of the seam to form a gas venting space (4); and (b) detecting and evaluating the upper sheet radius by means of a sensor (8) and a processing unit (9) to position the focal spot center (M) of the laser beam (7) and thus the lap seam in a narrow desired region within the upper sheet radius. An Independent claim is also included for equipment for carrying out the above process.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Laserstrahl-Schweißverfahren für Überlappnähte an beschichteten Blechen, insbesondere an zinkbeschichteten Stahlblechen, wobei ein Ausgasungsraum für das im Schweißbereich verdampfende Beschichtungsmaterial vorgesehen ist. Erfindungsgemäß liegen die beiden miteinander zu verschweißenden Bleche (1, 2) auf der einen Seite der Überlappnaht (3) aufeinander auf und sind auf der anderen Seite der Überlappnaht (3) geringfügig voneinander beabstandet, um zwischen sich den Ausgasungsraum (4) zu bilden, wobei mittels eines Sensors (8) dieser Radius (Ri) des Oberbleches (1) erkannt und in einer Recheneinheit (9) dahingehend ausgewertet wird, daß die Brennfleckmitte (M) des Schweiß-Laserstrahles (7) und somit auch die Überlappnaht (3) in einen engen Sollbereich (5) positioniert wird, der innerhalb des Bereiches dieses Radius (Ri) des Oberbleches (1) liegt. Bei einer bevorzugten Laserstrahl-Schweißvorrichtung zur Durchführung dieses Schweißverfahrens ist ein ansonsten üblicher Fokussierspiegel mittels eines mit einem Inkrementalgeber versehenen Schrittmotors quer zum Schweißnahtverlauf verfahrbar. Dieser übernimmt somit die Funktion eines Umlenkspiegels zur gewünschten Positionierung des Schweiß-Laserstrahles. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23K 26/00; B23K 26/02; B23K 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 26/035 (2014.01); B23K 26/04 (2006.01); B23K 26/16 (2006.01); B23K 26/244 (2014.01); B23K 26/32 (2014.01); B23K 26/322 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23K 26/037 (2015.10); B23K 26/04 (2013.01); B23K 26/16 (2013.01); B23K 26/244 (2015.10); B23K 26/32 (2013.01); B23K 26/322 (2013.01); B23K 2201/34 (2013.01); B23K 2203/50 (2015.10)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005944 A2 20000607; EP 1005944 A3 20030212; EP 1005944 B1 20040901; DE 19854217 A1 20000608; DE 19854217 C2 20020502

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-10-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910389 P 20041007

2004-10-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2004-09-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030412

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-02-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 23K 26/00 A

2003-02-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 23K 26/02 B

2003-02-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 23K 33/00 B

2003-02-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 23K 26/24 B

2003-02-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 23K 26/32 B

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI