Global Patent Index - EP 1005961 A1

EP 1005961 A1 2000-06-07 - Pocket tool with various tool bits

Title (en)

Pocket tool with various tool bits

Title (de)

Taschenwerkzeug mit Bitschlüssel

Title (fr)

Outil de poche avec des embouts multiples

Publication

EP 1005961 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98121315 A

Priority

EP 98121315 A

Abstract (en)

The pocket tool includes at least one body element with a functional element movable out from the handle. The functional element can be turned out of the body element against the force of an elastic element (28) round a pivot (29). The elastic element lies against the stub (30) of the functional element, and these two act in a locking cam and recess combination in at least one end position.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Mehrzwecktaschenwerkzeug, welches beispielsweise ein bis zwei Messerklingen, Schlitzschraubendreher, Kombizange, Schere, Kapselöffner, Dosenöffner, Pinzette und dergleichen aufweist und erfindungsgemäß einen Bitschlüssel und ein Bitmagazin für Einfach- oder Doppelbits, die bei Elektrogeräten, vorzugsweise bei Computern verwendet werden können. Das erfindungsgemäße Werkzeug ist klein, handlich und leicht und darüber hinaus hochgradig variabel einsetzbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25F 1/04; B25G 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 1/04 (2006.01); B26B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 11/00 (2013.01); B25F 1/04 (2013.01); B25G 1/085 (2013.01); B26B 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 6352010 B1 20020305; CN 1143758 C 20040331; CN 1255421 A 20000607; DE 59809819 D1 20031106; EP 1005961 A1 20000607; EP 1005961 B1 20031001; HK 1028213 A1 20041112

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809819 P 20031106

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-10-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020521

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990907

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI