Global patent index - EP 1005967 A1

EP 1005967 A1 2000-06-07 - Process and device for loading the moulds of pressure-glazed tile-forming presses

Title (en)

Process and device for loading the moulds of pressure-glazed tile-forming presses

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Füllung der Formen in Pressen zur Herstellung von keramischen druckglasierten Fliesen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif d'alimentation pour moules dans les presses pour la fabrication de carreaux en céramique émaillés pressés

Publication

EP 1005967 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98204045 A

Priority

EP 98204045 A

Abstract (en)

A process for loading the moulds (28) of tile-forming presses (27) comprises the following operations: arranging in a hopper (7) a succession of superposed irregular layers of powder material, the constituent material of one layer having different characteristics from the constituent material of the adjacent layers; pouring said material layers from the hopper (7) into a parallelepiped chamber (23) having two vertical major sides of dimensions substantially equal to the plan dimensions of the tile to be formed; pouring said material into a mould (28) forming cavity without modifying its distribution within the chamber (23); pressing said soft material in a direction perpendicular to the two major sides of the chamber. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 13/02; B30B 15/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 13/02 (2006.01); B30B 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 11/025 (2013.01); B28B 13/0215 (2013.01); B28B 13/022 (2013.01); B28B 13/0245 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005967 A1 20000607

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030905

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020930

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20001012;LT PAYMENT 20001012;LV PAYMENT 20001012;MK PAYMENT 20001012;RO PAYMENT 20001012;SI PAYMENT 20001012

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI