Global Patent Index - EP 1005981 A1

EP 1005981 A1 2000-06-07 - Device and method for the compensation of slip of a tubular printing form

Title (en)

Device and method for the compensation of slip of a tubular printing form

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Kompensation von Schlupf einer Druckformhülse

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode pour la compensation de la glissade d'un cliché d' impression tubulaire

Publication

EP 1005981 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123058 A

Priority

DE 19854343 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a first sensor to detect a first reference point of the printing form sleeve (17) in the peripheral direction and a second sensor for detecting a reference point for the position of a printing form sleeve (19) in the peripheral direction in a reference print mechanism (2). The sensor signals are fed to a comparator (26) whose output is connected to the cylinder's drive motor (9) that regulates the cylinder position. An Independent claim is also included for a method of compensating for slip of a pressure shaping sleeve.

Abstract (de)

Zur Kompensation von Schlupf einer Druckformhülse (17) auf dem Formzylinder (3) eines Druckwerks (1) mit einem eigenen Motor (15) wird ein erster Bezugspunkt (22, 22.1) für die Position der Druckform (17) von einem Sensor (24) abgetastet und in einer Vergleichseinrichtung (26) mit der Position einer Bezugsdruckformhülse (19) eines weiteren Druckwerkes (2) verglichen, wonach bei einer Abweichung von der Sollposition der Motor (9) nachgeregelt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/14 (2013.01); B41P 2233/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19854343 A1 20000531; DE 59913076 D1 20060413; EP 1005981 A1 20000607; EP 1005981 B1 20060125; US 6314883 B1 20011113

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59913076

- Effective date: 20140603

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND WEB SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 59913076

- Effective date: 20120626

2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081120

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081120

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081120

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071122

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071120

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061026

2006-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913076 P 20060413

2006-02-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060125

2006-01-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-01-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060125

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021206

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI