Global patent index - EP 1005987 A2

EP 1005987 A2 2000-06-07 - Ink jet head and method of manufacturing ink jet head

Title (en)

Ink jet head and method of manufacturing ink jet head

Title (de)

Tintenstrahldruckkopf und Verfahren zur Herstellung

Title (fr)

Tête d'impression à jet d'encre et sa méthode de fabrication

Publication

EP 1005987 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99123858 A

Priority

JP 34581698 A

Abstract (en)

An ink jet head to jet ink from a nozzle hole by applying an electric voltage to an electrode so as to deform a shape of a space forming an ink chamber, comprises two piezoelectric base plates given polarization; two non-piezoelectric base plates, wherein the ink chamber is formed by being enclosed by the two piezoelectric base plates facing each other and the two non-piezoelectric base plates facing each other; each of the two piezoelectric base plates comprising at least two lamination layers made of a piezoelectric material, wherein the two lamination layers are laminated such that the laminated surface is substantially parallel to the non-piezoelectric base plates and polarizing directions of the two lamination layers are opposite to each other; and electrodes provided on surfaces of the piezoelectric base plates and the non-piezoelectric base plates, wherein the surfaces face the ink chamber. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/14; B41J 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/1623 (2013.01); B41J 2/14209 (2013.01); B41J 2/1609 (2013.01); B41J 2/1632 (2013.01); B41J 2/1634 (2013.01); B41J 2/1642 (2013.01); B41J 2/1643 (2013.01); B41J 2/1646 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005987 A2 20000607; EP 1005987 A3 20001102; EP 1005987 B1 20070905; DE 69937032 D1 20071018; DE 69937032 T2 20080529

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69937032

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131209

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2008-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080606

2008-04-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-10-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69937032

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-10-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-09-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041213

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI