Global Patent Index - EP 1006033 A1

EP 1006033 A1 2000-06-07 - Anti-collision device for track guided vehicles for urban transport

Title (en)

Anti-collision device for track guided vehicles for urban transport

Title (de)

Kollisionsschutzeinrichtung für spurgeführte Stadtverkehrsfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Dispositif anti-collision pour véhicules guidés pour le transport urbain

Publication

EP 1006033 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120340 A

Priority

DE 19855830 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19855830C1] The tram buffer has a shock absorbing shaft (1) with a shock absorber (2) set forward of the chassis. The chassis can have a crumple zone. The shock absorber has a releasable connection (3) to allow rearward movement of the buffer plate.

Abstract (de)

Kollisionsschutzeinrichtung für spurgeführte Stadtverkehrsfahrzeuge mit einer möglichen lokalen Deformation im Frontbereich, so daß Auswirkungen auf Fahrzeug und Insassen beim Zusammenstoß mit anderen Verkehrsfahrzeugen reduziert werden. Die Einrichtung besteht aus einer Stoßstange (1), die um eine Länge (Y) über den Vorbau (5) hervorsteht, wobei die Länge (Y) sich aus einem Hub (Z) der Stoßdämpfer (2) und einem Abrißweg (Q) ergibt. Nach Ausschöpfung des Hubes (Z) versagen Abreißverbindungen (3), so daß die Stoßstange (1) in Führungen (4) kraftlos zurückweicht. Der Vorbau (5) kann sich mit seiner integrierten Verformungszone um den Deformationsweg (X) deformieren. Eine Länge (W) des feststehenden Teils der Stoßdämpfer (2) und eine Länge (T) in den Führungen (4) müssen mindestens so groß sein wie der Deformationsweg (X) des gewünschten Verformungsweges des Vorbaus (5) plus dem Abrißweg (Q). Mit der Erfindung können bei Crashsituationen die zu erwartenden Deformationen im Frontbereich von Stadtverkehrsfahrzeugen kontrolliert realisiert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 15/06; B61D 17/06; B61G 11/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61G 11/00 (2006.01); B61D 15/06 (2006.01); B61D 17/06 (2006.01); B61G 11/16 (2006.01); B61G 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61G 11/16 (2013.01); B61D 15/06 (2013.01); B61D 17/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19855830 C1 20000224; AT 273819 T 20040915; CZ 292681 B6 20031112; CZ 9903955 A3 20000816; EP 1006033 A1 20000607; EP 1006033 B1 20040818; ES 2230782 T3 20050501; PL 194196 B1 20070531; PL 336781 A1 20000605; PT 1006033 E 20041231

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161012

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161102

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161012

2017-07-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161012

2017-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 273819 T

- Effective date: 20161012

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161011

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151101

2016-07-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151101

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150505

2015-07-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150413

2015-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141012

2015-06-24 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20040403891

- Effective date: 20150505

2015-04-21 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150413

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2014-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20131021

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20131011

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130412

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DWA DEUTSCHE WAGGONBAU GMBH

- Free text: DWA DEUTSCHE WAGGONBAU GMBH#KABLOWER WEG 89#12526 BERLIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- DWA DEUTSCHE WAGGONBAU GMBH#KABLOWER WEG 89#12526 BERLIN (DE)

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-07-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2230782 T3

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2005-01-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION (BAHNTECHNOLOGIE) HOLDI

- Free text: DWA DEUTSCHE WAGGONBAU GMBH#KABLOWER WEG 89#12526 BERLIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION (BAHNTECHNOLOGIE) HOLDING GERMANY GMBH#KABLOWER WEG 89#12526 BERLIN (DE)

2004-12-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20041025

2004-12-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-17 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040403891

2004-12-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-11-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041118

2004-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-12 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041012

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910266 P 20040923

2004-09-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-18 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-08-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI