Global patent index - EP 1006054 A1

EP 1006054 A1 2000-06-07 - Blister package

Title (en)

Blister package

Title (de)

Blisterpackung

Title (fr)

Emballage du type "blister"

Publication

EP 1006054 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402962 A

Priority

FR 9815114 A

Abstract (en)

Blister pack, especially for pills, has extra cell to contain part of a pill, and a corner of a semi-rigid sheet folds over to cover it. The pack consists of a sheet (3) of a semi-rigid material with a series of cells (8) to receive pills which can be broken in half. The cells are covered by a layer of a sealing material (22) which can be broken to extract the pills one at a time. One end of the semi-rigid sheet has an additional cell (9) designed to receive a half pill. The sheet has a fold line (12) which allows its corner (3) to be folded over and inserted in a slit (27), protecting the half pill until required for use.

Abstract (fr)

Cet emballage (1) comporte une plaquette (3) d'un matériau semi-rigide qui présente, outre des alvéoles (8) de conditionnement de produits complets (2), initialement fermés par une feuille (22) d'un matériau déchirable, un alvéole supplémentaire (9) destiné à recevoir un fragment de produit après l'ouverture de l'un des alvéoles de conditionnement (8) et l'utilisation partielle du produit complet (2) qu'il contenait. La plaquette (3) présente une amorce rectiligne (11,12) de pliage, dégageant un couvercle (23) qui peut être rabattu sur l'alvéole supplémentaire (9) pour le fermer et y retenir le fragment de produit, et une entaille (27) dans laquelle une zone marginale (29) du couvercle (23) ainsi rabattu s'engage pour verrouiller provisoirement le couvercle (23) dans sa position d'obturation de l'alvéole supplémentaire (9). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/327 (2013.01); B65D 2575/3227 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006054 A1 20000607; FR 2786469 A1 20000602; FR 2786469 B1 20010216

INPADOC legal status

2005-05-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041119

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031027

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI