Global patent index - EP 1006055 A3

EP 1006055 A3 2000-10-04 - Package for toothbrush

Title (en)

Package for toothbrush

Title (de)

Zahnbürstenverpackung

Title (fr)

Emballage pour brosse à dents

Publication

EP 1006055 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99118775 A

Priority

CH 240798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1006055A2] The toothbrush is packed in a blister-type package comprising a locator (2) for the brush and a plastics accommodation part (3) shaped to correspond to the form of the brush. The package has an optical display arrangement (4) on which is an information carrier. The carrier incorporates at least two graphic presentations deviating from one another. Above the information carrier is a lens arrangement (6) containing a number of lens components so formed and arranged that on observation of the information carrier through the lens arrangement from different angles one of the graphic presentations is visible on the information carrier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/36 (2006.01); B65D 75/52 (2006.01); A46B 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/36 (2013.01); B65D 75/366 (2013.01); B65D 75/52 (2013.01); A46B 17/04 (2013.01); A46B 2200/1066 (2013.01); B65D 2203/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006055 A2 20000607; EP 1006055 A3 20001004

INPADOC legal status

2002-07-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020115

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-06-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010330

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI