Global Patent Index - EP 1006056 A1

EP 1006056 A1 2000-06-07 - Container for foodstuff and medicaments which is easy to open and reclosable

Title (en)

Container for foodstuff and medicaments which is easy to open and reclosable

Title (de)

Behälter für Lebensmittel und Medikamente der einfach zu öffnen und wiederverschliessbar ist

Title (fr)

Emballage pour le conditionnement de produits alimentaires et médical avec ouverture facile et refermeture

Publication

EP 1006056 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98490032 A

Priority

EP 98490032 A

Abstract (en)

The package (1) consists of a rigid or supple tray (2) with a thermoformable structure and an outer supporting layer (5), an intermediate layer (6) of a permanent adhesive, and an inner weldable layer (7). It has a lid (3) of a weldable or thermoformable material, and an inner sealed and impermeable pouch (8) formed by a weld seam (4) between the weldable layers of the base and lid.

Abstract (fr)

Emballage (1) pour le conditionnement des produits alimentaires solides, liquides ou pâteux, (19) tels que des produits laitiers, de la charcuterie et des viandes et le conditionnement de produits médicaux, permettant l'ouverture facile et la refermeture d'un couvercle sur l'emballage qui se compose : d'une barquette (2), rigide et souple utilisant une structure thermoformable constituée : d'une couche support (5) extérieure de polyester amorphe, d'une couche adhésive (6) intermédiaire à effet permanent, d'une couche soudante (7) intérieure de polyéthylène, d'un couvercle (3) constitué d'une couche soudante en polyéthylène, ou d'une structure thermoformable semblable à celle de la barquette (2). Cet emballage est caractérisé par le fait que l'emballage (1) présente une poche (8) imperméable et étanche, qui reçoit le produit alimentaire solide, liquide ou pâteux ou médical (19), délimité par : la couche soudante (7) de la barquette (2), la couche soudante constituant le couvercle (3), le cordon de soudure (4), afin d'augmenter l'herméticité de l'emballage (1) et de préserver son étanchéité jusqu'à la date limite de consommation du produit alimentaire (19), avant la première ouverture de l'emballage (1). La présente invention trouvera notamment son application dans les industries de fabrication d'emballages et de conditionnement de produits alimentaires ou médicaux qui seront ensuite mis à la disposition dans les surfaces commerciales ou les pharmacies. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 77/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/2096 (2013.01); B65D 77/2044 (2013.01); B65D 2577/2033 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1352 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006056 A1 20000607; EP 1006056 B1 20031210; AT 256050 T 20031215; CA 2290856 A1 20000601; CA 2290856 C 20080429; DE 69820454 D1 20040122; DE 69820454 T2 20050915; DK 1006056 T3 20040405; EP 1348639 A1 20031001; ES 2212248 T3 20040716; PT 1006056 E 20040430; US 6345726 B1 20020212

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111202

2013-07-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130703

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111201

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2013-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120701

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 256050 T

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111202

2012-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69820454

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-09-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-07-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-07-23 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2012-07-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120701

2012-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *WIPAK GRYSPEERT

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-06-11 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2011-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110208

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20101220

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101220

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110107

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20101220

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20081120

2009-06-17 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20081120

2005-01-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: NORDENIA TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

2004-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-11-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: NORDENIA TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2212248 T3

2004-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040309

2004-04-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-03-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-03-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040213

2004-03-10 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69820454 P 20040122

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BEEUWAERT, BERNARD

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000610

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI