Global Patent Index - EP 1006057 A1

EP 1006057 A1 2000-06-07 - Dosage device

Title (en)

Dosage device

Title (de)

Dosiervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de dosage

Publication

EP 1006057 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107802 A

Priority

CH 241098 A

Abstract (en)

Channels (1, 2) for first and second components connect at an inlet. One channel is closed at its inlet by a piston (3). The channels join at an outlet, such that the pressure at the main inlet section, combines the components at the outlet. An Independent claim is included for the corresponding methods of dispensing and use. Preferred features: Two parts (4, 5), define the first channel between themselves, whilst the second part (5) defines the second channel internally. The second channel is central within the first. First and/or second channels taper at the outlet. The outlet of the second channel lies fully within the first channel. Channels are generally cylindrical and held in registration by fixed spacers not obstructing flow. Channel(s) may have multiple outlets and/or bifurcations in the outlet region. Attachments (13, 17) allow connection to a reservoir (10) for a first component; also to a static mixer (8). The unit is plastic. The second and/or first channel is closed by the piston. The channel closed by the piston (3) is filled with one of the components. An expressing unit is used in a corresponding applicator (also claimed), which includes the static mixer and an application nozzle (9).

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Dosiervorrichtung für Kleingebinde beschrieben, wobei mit Schlauchbeuteln das beste Kosten-Nutzen-Verhältnis verbunden mit optimaler Öko-Bilanz erzielt werden kann. Die erfindungsgemässe Dosiervorrichtung umfasst mindestens einen ersten Kanal (1) für eine erst Komponente und mindestens einen zweiten Kanal (2) für eine zweite Komponente, wobei der erste Kanal (1) und der zweite Kanal (2) in einem Eingangsbereich kommunizieren und wobei entweder der mindestens eine erste Kanal oder der mindestens eine zweite Kanal im Eingangsbereich mit einem Kolbenmittel (3) verschlossen ist und wobei der mindestens eine erste Kanal (1) und der mindestens eine zweite Kanal (2) in einem Ausgangsbereich kommunizieren, derart, dass ein Druck im Eingangsbereich ein Zusammenführen der mindestens einen ersten Komponente mit der mindestens einen zweiten Komponente im Ausgangsbereich bewirkt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/32; B05C 17/005; B65D 83/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 35/24 (2006.01); B65D 83/00 (2006.01); B05C 17/005 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 35/242 (2013.01); B65D 83/0005 (2013.01); B05C 17/00553 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0749530 A1 19961227 - ALFATECHNIC AG [CH], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006057 A1 20000607

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021008

2002-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020527

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI PT SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ZABEL, LUTZ

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MAGYROVITS, JANOS

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI