Global patent index - EP 1006059 A2

EP 1006059 A2 2000-06-07 - Package for a cable

Title (en)

Package for a cable

Title (de)

Verpackung für ein Kabel

Title (fr)

Emballage pour un câble

Publication

EP 1006059 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123740 A

Priority

DE 19856172 A

Abstract (en)

The cable packaging (1) involves the cable rolled into a ring formation and comprises a sheet (4) which encompasses the cable roll ring (2). The packaging has an opening rip aid. The cable windings are bundled by at least one band-shaped cable binding component (3). The opening rip aid is formed as a thread (5). The rip thread runs between the cable roll ring and the sheet and is guided outwards from at least a first end (6) through the sheet.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Verpackung (1) für ein Kabel, das zu einer ringförmigen Kabelrolle (2) aufgerollt ist, bestehend aus einer Folie (4), die den Kabelrollenring (2) umgibt. Um die Folie (4) der Verpackung (1) ohne zusätzliche Hilfsmittel einfach und schnell öffnen zu können, schlägt die Erfindung vor, dass die Verpackung (1) eine Aufreißhilfe aufweist. Die Aufreißhilfe ist vorzugsweise als ein Reißfaden (5) ausgebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 85/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 65/28 (2006.01); B65D 65/34 (2006.01); B65D 85/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006059 A2 20000607; EP 1006059 A3 20020619; DE 19856172 A1 20000615

INPADOC legal status

2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021220

2003-04-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-03-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI