Global Patent Index - EP 1006096 A1

EP 1006096 A1 2000-06-07 - Non-azide gas generating composition

Title (en)

Non-azide gas generating composition

Title (de)

Azidfreie, gaserzeugende Zusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition génératrice de gaz exempt d'azoture

Publication

EP 1006096 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123906 A

Priority

DE 29821541 U

Abstract (en)

An azide free gas producing composition (I) , preferably for use in safety devices in motor vehicles comprises (A) 20-60 wt.% fuel and (B) 40-80 wt.% of an at least three component oxidising mixture. (A) comprises at least 95 wt.% of a guanidine compound and 0-5 wt.% of another fuel. (B) comprises 20-80 wt.% transition metal oxide, 0-50 wt.% basic copper nitrate, 1-15 wt.% metal chlorate, metal perchlorate and/or ammonium perchlorate and 1-15 wt% alkali nitrate and/or alkaline earth nitrate.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung stellt eine azidfreie gaserzeugende Zusammensetzung bereit, insbesondere zur Verwendung in Sicherheitseinrichtungen für Kraftfahrzeuge, mit einem aus einer oder mehreren Komponenten bestehenden Brennstoff in einem Anteil von 20 bis 60 Gew.-% und einem aus mindestens drei Komponenten bestehenden Oxidatorgemisch in einem Anteil von 40 bis 80 Gew.-%, jeweils bezogen auf die Gesamtzusammensetzung. Die erfindungsgemäße Zusammensetzung ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß der Brennstoff aus einer Guanidinverbindung in einem Anteil von mindestens 95 Gew.-% und einer weiteren Brennstoffkomponente in einem Anteil von 0 bis weniger als 5 Gew.-%, jeweils bezogen auf den Brennstoff, besteht, und daß das Oxidatorgemisch aus einem oder mehreren Übergangsmetalloxiden in einem Anteil von 20 bis 80 Gew.-%, basischem Kupfernitrat in einem Anteil von 0 bis 50 Gew.-%, Metallchlorat, Metallperchlorat, Ammoniumperchlorat oder deren Mischungen in einem Anteil von 1 bis 15 Gew.-% und Alkalinitrat, Erdalkalinitrat oder deren Mischungen in einem Anteil von 1 bis 15 Gew.-%, jeweils bezogen auf das Oxidatorgemisch, besteht.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06D 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06D 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06D 5/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29821541 U1 19990218; EP 1006096 A1 20000607; EP 1006096 B1 20020925; US 2005189052 A1 20050901

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151231

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071202

2008-08-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-12-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061204

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2004-11-11 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041111

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902827 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL SE

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020322

2001-03-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-03-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL SE

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY LI

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001205

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI