Global Patent Index - EP 1006096 B1

EP 1006096 B1 2002-09-25 - Non-azide gas generating composition

Title (en)

Non-azide gas generating composition

Title (de)

Azidfreie, gaserzeugende Zusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition génératrice de gaz exempt d'azoture

Publication

EP 1006096 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123906 A

Priority

DE 29821541 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1006096A1] An azide free gas producing composition (I) , preferably for use in safety devices in motor vehicles comprises (A) 20-60 wt.% fuel and (B) 40-80 wt.% of an at least three component oxidising mixture. (A) comprises at least 95 wt.% of a guanidine compound and 0-5 wt.% of another fuel. (B) comprises 20-80 wt.% transition metal oxide, 0-50 wt.% basic copper nitrate, 1-15 wt.% metal chlorate, metal perchlorate and/or ammonium perchlorate and 1-15 wt% alkali nitrate and/or alkaline earth nitrate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06D 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06D 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06D 5/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29821541 U1 19990218; EP 1006096 A1 20000607; EP 1006096 B1 20020925; US 2005189052 A1 20050901

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171231

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-12-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071202

2008-08-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-12-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061204

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2004-11-11 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041111

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902827 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL SE

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020322

2001-03-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-03-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL SE

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY LI

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001205

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI