Global Patent Index - EP 1006176 A1

EP 1006176 A1 2000-06-07 - Low-concentrated highly viscous aqueous softener compositions

Title (en)

Low-concentrated highly viscous aqueous softener compositions

Title (de)

Niedrigkonzentrierte, hochviskose wässrige Weichspülmittel

Title (fr)

Compositions adoucissantes très visqueuses et faiblement concentrées

Publication

EP 1006176 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113291 A

Priority

DE 19855366 A

Abstract (en)

Highly viscous aqueous fabric softener of low concentration contains 3-10, preferably 4-5 wt. % partial ester (I) of N-methyl-N,N,N-triethanolammonium methosulfate with an unsaturated, 14-18 carbon (C) fatty acid, in which the ratio of hydroxyl (OH) groups to the acyl groups is 1:(1.6-2). Highly viscous aqueous fabric softener of low concentration contains 3-10, preferably 4-5 wt. % partial ester (I) of N-methyl-N,N,N-triethanolammonium methosulfate with an unsaturated, 14-18 carbon (C) fatty acid: R = the residue of a 14-18 C fatty acid with an iodine number of 15-25; a = 1, 2 or 3 in which the ratio of hydroxyl (OH) groups to the acyl groups R is 1:(1.6-2). An Independent claim is also included for the production of the formulation by adding (I) to warm water at 28-45 degrees C, optionally in conjunction with solvent, dye and perfume oil, and dispersing (I).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft niedrigkonzentrierte, hochviskose wässrige Wäscheweichspülmittel-Dispersionen auf Basis von quaternären Triethanolaminfettsäureestern mit einem definierten Verhältnis von Triethanolamin zu Fettsäure, wobei die Fettkomponente ein bestimmten Sättigungsgrad aufweist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/00; C11D 1/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/62 (2013.01); C11D 3/0015 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006176 A1 20000607; EP 1006176 B1 20041222; CA 2288255 A1 20000601; CA 2288255 C 20070206; DE 19855366 A1 20000608; ES 2235404 T3 20050701; PL 336869 A1 20000605; US 6180594 B1 20010130

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160715

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GOLDSCHMIDT REWO G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20050731

2006-02-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2235404 T3

2005-06-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050527

2005-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911323 P 20050127

2005-01-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GOLDSCHMIDT REWO GMBH & CO. KG

2004-01-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LOW-CONCENTRATED HIGHLY VISCOUS AQUEOUS SOFTENER COMPOSITIONS

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030225

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000701

2000-07-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GOLDSCHMIDT REWO GMBH & CO. KG

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI