Global patent index - EP 1006202 A2

EP 1006202 A2 2000-06-07 - Process and device for heat treating workpieces

Title (en)

Process and device for heat treating workpieces

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Wärmebehandlung von Teilen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le traitement thermique de pièces

Publication

EP 1006202 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122351 A

Priority

DE 19856191 A

Abstract (en)

Heat treatment process, comprises preheating workpieces (11) in air prior to homogenization annealing under protective gas and martensitic quench hardening. A heat treatment process, preferably for steel workpieces, comprises preheating the workpieces (11) in air at below their transformation temperature (preferably 300, especially 400-600 degrees C), homogenization annealing under protective gas at above the transformation temperature (preferably above the steel eutectoid temperature of 723 degrees C) and then martensitic hardening in a quenching bath (19). An Independent claim is also included for an installation for carrying out the above process.

Abstract (de)

Es werden ein Verfahren und eine Anlage zur Wärmebehandlung von Teilen angegeben, womit vor dem Glühen zum Härten der Teile (11) in einem Homogenisierungsofen (16) unter Schutzgas in einer vorgeschalteten Vorwärmstation (14) zuvor ein Aufheizen der Teile (11) an Luft erfolgt. Auf diese Weise werden die Gesamtkosten der Anlage (10) reduziert, da der Ofen (16) zur Glühbehandlung unter Schutzgas deutlich verkürzt werden kann. Zur Härtung der Teile (11) ist eine Härtungsstation (18) vorgesehen, die vorzugsweise über einen seitlichen Beschickungskanal (44) unmittelbar mit der Auslauföffnung (40) des Glühofens (16) gekoppelt ist. Innerhalb der Härtungsstation (18) können Teile in mehreren Ebenen auf einem Teileträger (48) aufgenommen werden (Fig. 1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 1/18; C21D 1/22; C21D 1/63; C21D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/18 (2006.01); C21D 1/26 (2006.01); C21D 9/00 (2006.01); C21D 1/63 (2006.01); C21D 1/74 (2006.01); C21D 9/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/0062 (2013.01); C21D 1/18 (2013.01); C21D 1/26 (2013.01); C21D 1/63 (2013.01); C21D 1/74 (2013.01); C21D 9/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006202 A2 20000607; EP 1006202 A3 20030806; DE 19856191 A1 20000615; DE 19856191 C2 20010215

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040916

2004-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040505

2004-06-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-04-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT NL SE

2004-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040108

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 21D 1/18 A

2003-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 21D 1/22 B

2003-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 21D 1/63 B

2003-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 21D 9/00 B

2003-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 21D 1/26 B

2003-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 21D 9/40 B

2003-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 27D 5/00 B

2000-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AICHELIN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI