Global patent index - EP 1006218 A2

EP 1006218 A2 2000-06-07 - Plated metal part and method of manufacturing same

Title (en)

Plated metal part and method of manufacturing same

Title (de)

Beschichtetes Metallteil und Methode zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Pièce métallique plaquée et sa méthode de fabrication

Publication

EP 1006218 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99124157 A

Priority

  • JP 34474198 A
  • JP 34474598 A
  • JP 21589699 A

Abstract (en)

A material part (3,28,71,91,110), in particular a metal component made of an aluminium alloy having a slide surface with which another part is slidably contactable is provided with at least a first plating layer (13) of a material having a high wear-resistance. In order to reduce the influence of different thermal expansion and contraction, a fine network of cracks (15) is formed in the plating layer (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 5/30; F01L 1/12; F16D 65/12; F16J 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/56 (2006.01); C25D 5/44 (2006.01); C25D 5/48 (2006.01); C25D 7/00 (2006.01); C25D 15/02 (2006.01); F01L 1/14 (2006.01); F01L 1/16 (2006.01); F01L 1/18 (2006.01); F16D 65/00 (2006.01); F16D 65/12 (2006.01); F16D 69/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/16 (2013.01); C25D 3/565 (2013.01); C25D 5/44 (2013.01); C25D 5/48 (2013.01); C25D 7/00 (2013.01); C25D 15/02 (2013.01); F01L 1/14 (2013.01); F01L 1/18 (2013.01); F16D 65/0025 (2013.01); F16D 65/12 (2013.01); F01L 2101/00 (2013.01); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01); F05C 2251/042 (2013.01); F16D 2065/132 (2013.01); F16D 2065/1392 (2013.01); F16D 2069/004 (2013.01); F16D 2200/003 (2013.01); F16D 2250/00 (2013.01); F16D 2250/0046 (2013.01); F16D 2250/0092 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49263 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49982 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12556 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006218 A2 20000607; EP 1006218 A3 20011031; EP 1006218 B1 20060308; DE 69930191 D1 20060504; DE 69930191 T2 20060803; US 2002153210 A1 20021024; US 6561322 B2 20030513

INPADOC legal status

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060308

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061202

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20061202

2007-04-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2007-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061211

2006-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69930191

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-05-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-03-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-03-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060308

2005-09-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PLATED DISC BRAKE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030122

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2002-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020425

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 25D 5/30 A, 7F 01L 1/12 B, 7F 16J 1/00 B, 7F 16D 65/12 B, 7F 02F 3/10 B, 7C 25D 3/20 B

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI