Global Patent Index - EP 1006224 A2

EP 1006224 A2 2000-06-07 - Method and device for manufacturing condensed yarn

Title (en)

Method and device for manufacturing condensed yarn

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von verdichtetem Garn

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la production de fil condensé

Publication

EP 1006224 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121016 A

Priority

DE 19856121 A

Abstract (en)

During spinning of yarn with a condensing device (12) using air suction (S), the airflow is monitored at each position. When it falls below a limiting value, a fault signal is given or the process is stopped. Either the static or dynamic pressure, or the flow rate can be measured. An Independent claim is also included for a spinning position with a drafting system (2,3,10) for the sliver (1) and a suction arrangement (12) providing a suction flow (S). Instrumentation in the suction duct (22) is connected to an evaluation unit or alarm.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von verdichtetem Garn, bei welchem nach Verziehen einer Faserlunte 1 diese mittels Saugluftströmung verdichtet und anschließend verdreht wird. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Saugluftströmung S überwacht und bei Unterschreiten eines Schwellenwertes eine Meldung abgegeben, welche ein Fehler- und/oder Abstellsignal auslöst. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 13/14; D01H 5/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 13/16 (2006.01); D01H 5/26 (2006.01); D01H 5/72 (2006.01); D01H 5/74 (2006.01); D01H 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 13/14 (2013.01); D01H 5/26 (2013.01); D01H 5/72 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006224 A2 20000607; EP 1006224 A3 20001115; EP 1006224 B1 20030709; EP 1006224 B2 20051130; DE 19856121 A1 20000608; DE 19856121 C2 20031218; JP 2000170043 A 20000620; US 6134872 A 20001024

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161031

2017-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161031

2017-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906252

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141021

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141023

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: LEVERKUSER STRASSE 65, 42897 REMSCHEID (DE)

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131023

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAURER GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG, 42897 REMSCHEID, DE

- Document: DE 59906252

- Effective date: 20130918

2013-08-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER AND PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANW, CH

2013-08-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SAURER GERMANY GMBH AND CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ZINSER TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH, DE

2005-12-30 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2005-11-30 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2004-06-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG

- Effective date: 20040408

2004-03-31 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906252 P 20030814

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020925

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 01H 13/14 A, 7D 01H 5/72 B, 7D 01H 5/26 B, 7D 01H 5/60 B

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI