Global patent index - EP 1006226 A1

EP 1006226 A1 2000-06-07 - Guide bars for a Jacquard machine

Title (en)

Guide bars for a Jacquard machine

Title (de)

Führungsstangen für eine Jaquard-Webeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Barres de guidage pour une machine Jacquard

Publication

EP 1006226 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99121092 A

Priority

DE 19855709 A

Abstract (en)

The electromagnet incorporated into the selector has an oval shaped iron core and coil (14). Sheet metal pole pieces (18) are placed on both sides and are spaced less than 13 mm, preferably 8 or 7 mm, apart. The core can consist of several circular pieces and the pole pieces are U-shaped.

Abstract (de)

Die Führungsstange nach der vorliegenden Erfindung ist gegenüber den bekannten Führungsstangen erheblich schmäler ausgebildet (statt 13 mm vorzugsweise 10 mm oder kleiner). Dies wird durch eine niedrigere Bauhöhe des in der Führungsstange (10) integrierten Magnetsystems erreicht. Das Magnetsystem weist einen im Querschnitt länglichen oder ovalförmigen Eisenkern (12) auf, um den die Erregerspule (14) gewickelt ist. Auf den beiden Stirnseiten des Eisenkerns (12) liegen Polbleche (18) auf, die zueinander mit ihren Deckenwandungen mit < 13 mm beabstandet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03C 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03C 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 3/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006226 A1 20000607; EP 1006226 B1 20040114; DE 19855709 A1 20000608; DE 19855709 B4 20080124; JP 2000170051 A 20000620; KR 100371075 B1 20030205; KR 20000047849 A 20000725; US 7117898 B1 20061010

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151031

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151022

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151031

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141029

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091022

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-10-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-02-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040114

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH FR GB IT LI

2004-01-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-03-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000714

2001-03-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE CH FR GB IT LI

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-09-01 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

2000-08-02 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBC

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH FR GB IT LI

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI