Global Patent Index - EP 1006231 A2

EP 1006231 A2 2000-06-07 - Method for controlling washload drying in a clothes drying or similar apparatus

Title (en)

Method for controlling washload drying in a clothes drying or similar apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Kontrolle der Wäschetrocknung in einem Wäschetrockner oder einer ähnlichen Maschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour contrôler la charge de linge à sécher dans un séche linge ou appareil similaire

Publication

EP 1006231 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99120655 A

Priority

IT PN980087 A

Abstract (en)

Method for controlling washload drying in a clothes drying apparatus, in which an air flow (18) is heated up and used to remove moisture from the washload and convey the same moisture into a collecting container (11). The variation in the level (L) of the water so removed from the washload is repeatedly detected at pre-set time intervals (t) and the heating of the air flow (18) is turned off in response to said variation being detected to show a decrease below a pre-determined value during at least one (tx) of said time intervals. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 58/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/28 (2013.01); D06F 2058/2832 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006231 A2 20000607; EP 1006231 A3 20011031; IT 1305556 B1 20010509; IT PN980087 A1 20000605

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020503

2002-08-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI