Global patent index - EP 1006233 A1

EP 1006233 A1 2000-06-07 - Ironing board

Title (en)

Ironing board

Title (de)

Bügeltisch

Title (fr)

Table à repasser

Publication

EP 1006233 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118579 A

Priority

DE 19854090 A

Abstract (en)

At least one of the elements (10,11) made of expanded metal is deformed, at least in sections, geometrically in relation to the expanded metal plane. At least one of the geometrically deformed sections (16) are ring-shaped when the metal is viewed from above.

Abstract (de)

Bügeltisch mit einem als Bügelfläche beziehungsweise Abstellfläche dienenden Oberteil umfassend wenigstens einen äußeren umlaufenden Tragrahmen und wenigstens ein die Bügelfläche beziehungsweise Abstellfläche auf spannendes Element aus Streckmetall, das mit dem Tragrahmen verbunden ist, wobei wenigstens eines der Elemente (10, 11) aus Streckmetall wenigstens bereichsweise aus der Ebene des Streckmetalls nach unten oder oben hin geometrisch verformt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 81/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 81/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 81/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19854090 A1 20000525; EP 1006233 A1 20000607

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030204

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020409

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE IT NL

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: THEIS BURKHARD

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KREBS GERHARD

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HAEBEL REINER

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GORITZKA DIRK

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHROEDER OLAF

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WALD SABINE

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DIEHL SANDRA

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WELLER FRIEDRICH-ERNST

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: THEIS BURKHARD

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KREBS GERHARD

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HAEBEL REINER

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GORITZKA DIRK

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHROEDER OLAF

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WALD SABINE

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DIEHL SANDRA

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WELLER FRIEDRICH-ERNST

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT NL

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI