Global Patent Index - EP 1006239 A1

EP 1006239 A1 2000-06-07 - Concrete sleeper and sleeper shoe

Title (en)

Concrete sleeper and sleeper shoe

Title (de)

Betonschwelle mit Auskleideschuh für Eisenbahnschienen

Title (fr)

Traverse en beton et son chausson

Publication

EP 1006239 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99811070 A

Priority

CH 241598 A

Abstract (en)

The concrete body (1) of the railway sleeper functions with a rubber cladding shoe (6) and has an upper horizontal surface on which at least one rail supports. In the body is a drainage gutter (14) with an upwardly facing groove (15), in which the upper edge (8) of the cladding shoe extends. An intermediate space (16) opposite to the outside of the groove (15) remains free. The groove has braced-apart sidewalls (17,18) which form a downwardly facing V-shaped groove. The cladding shoe has an upper edge with parallel running walls, which extend over a section in the groove in the concrete body.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Betonschwelle mit einem Auskleideschuh (6) aus Gummi für Eisenbahnschienen. Ähnliche Schwellen sind bereits bekannt, die einen Auskleideschuh (6) aus Gummi aufweisen, der die untere Hälfte des Betonkörpers (1) der Schwelle umfasst. Der obere Rand der (8) des Auskleideschuhs (6) aus Gummi ist dabei normalerweise mittels einer Abtropftraufe (14) geschützt, die ihn während des Schwelleneinbaus vor mechanischen Beschädigungen schützt. Diese Traufe (14) kann jedoch nicht verhindern, dass Regenwasser, vermischt mit Schlamm, usw., zwischen dem Auskleideschuh (6) aus Gummi und dem Betonkörper (1) eindringen kann, was schwere Beeinträchtigung der Dämpfungswirkung des Auskleideschuhs (6) aus Gummi verursachen kann. Um diese Gefahr auszuschalten, sieht die vorliegende Erfindung vor, dass die Abtropftraufe (14) eine nach oben gerichtete Nut (15) aufweist, in welche der obere Rand (8) des Auskleideschuhs (6) aus Gummi hineinragt. Die Eindringtiefe (t) des oberen Randes (8) in die Nut (15) ist in der Regel mindestens so gross wie die Dicke (z) des oberen Randes (8) an der Eindringstelle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 1/00 (2006.01); E01B 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 1/005 (2013.01); E01B 1/008 (2013.01); E01B 3/28 (2013.01); E01B 2204/01 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4336516 C1 19950427 - HEISIG UDO GMBH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006239 A1 20000607; EP 1006239 B1 20060712; AT 333004 T 20060815; CH 693509 A5 20030915

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151119

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151119

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 333004 T

- Effective date: 20151119

2016-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141127

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141126

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070413

2006-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ING. CARLO GAGGINI

2006-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH IT LI

2006-07-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060712

2001-03-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH IT LI

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH IT LI

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI