Global Patent Index - EP 1006240 A2

EP 1006240 A2 2000-06-07 - Battery loading structure for snow removing machine

Title (en)

Battery loading structure for snow removing machine

Title (de)

Batterietragestruktur für Schneeräumgeräte

Title (fr)

Structure de support d'une batterie pour dispositif de chasse-neige

Publication

EP 1006240 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99123844 A

Priority

  • JP 34596298 A
  • JP 23358699 A

Abstract (en)

Onto an auger housing (8) is mounted a battery stand (60) also serving as reinforcement for the stand (60). The stand (60) is provided with snow dropping bores (60e and 60f). A battery (72) is loaded on the stand (60) and covered with a cover (80) having slopes (80a and 80b) used for dropping snow therealong.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01H 5/04; E01H 5/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01H 5/04 (2006.01); E01H 5/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01H 5/098 (2013.01); E01H 5/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006240 A2 20000607; EP 1006240 A3 20020410; EP 1006240 B1 20050427; AT 294283 T 20050515; DE 69924947 D1 20050602; DE 69924947 T2 20060302; NO 332762 B1 20130107; NO 995943 A 20000605; NO 995943 D0 19991203

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-11 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2010-04-15 [REG CH PUEA] ASSIGNMENT OF THE SHARE

- Owner name: OKA INDUSTRY CO., LTD.

- Free text: YANMAR AGRICULTURAL EQUIPMENT CO., LTD.#1-32, CHAYAMACHI, KITA-KU, OSAKA-SHI#OSAKA-FU 530-0013 (JP) $ YOKA INDUSTRY CO., LTD.#200, ASAKURA, YOKA-CHO#YABU-GUN, HYOGO 667-0024 (JP) -TRANSFER TO- YOKA INDUSTRY CO., LTD.#200, ASAKURA, YOKA-CHO#YABU-GUN, HYOGO 667-0024 (JP) $ YANMAR CO., LTD.#1-32, CHAYAMACHI, KITA-KU, OSAKA-SHI#OSAKA 530-0013 (JP)

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: YANMAR AGRICULTURAL EQUIPMENT CO., LTD.

- Free text: YANMAR AGRICULTURAL EQUIPMENT CO., LTD.#1-32, CHAYAMACHI, KITA-KU, OSAKA-SHI#OSAKA-FU 530-0013 (JP) $ YOKA INDUSTRY CO., LTD.#200, ASAKURA, YOKA-CHO#YABU-GUN, HYOGO 667-0024 (JP) -TRANSFER TO- YANMAR AGRICULTURAL EQUIPMENT CO., LTD.#1-32, CHAYAMACHI, KITA-KU, OSAKA-SHI#OSAKA-FU 530-0013 (JP) $ YOKA INDUSTRY CO., LTD.#200, ASAKURA, YOKA-CHO#YABU-GUN, HYOGO 667-0024 (JP)

2006-04-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060130

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-06-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69924947 P 20050602

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-04-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2004-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040123

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020521

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI