Global Patent Index - EP 1006245 A2

EP 1006245 A2 2000-06-07 - Accommodation

Title (en)

Accommodation

Title (de)

Wohnung

Title (fr)

Logement

Publication

EP 1006245 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99309640 A

Priority

GB 9826508 A

Abstract (en)

Accommodation comprises two units 1a, 1b each having a sleeping section 2a, 2b and a living section 3a, 4a, 5a, 3b, 4b, 5b, the living sections of the two units being adjacent at the same level and the sleeping sections lying one above the other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 3/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006245 A2 20000607; EP 1006245 A3 20020130; CA 2291663 A1 20000602; GB 2344361 A 20000607; GB 9826508 D0 19990127; JP 2000160857 A 20000613

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-11-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI