Global patent index - EP 1006248 A1

EP 1006248 A1 2000-06-07 - Remote-controlled access control device, in particular for a motor vehicle and portable transponder therefor

Title (en)

Remote-controlled access control device, in particular for a motor vehicle and portable transponder therefor

Title (de)

Fernsteuerbare Zugangskontrolleinrichtung, insbesondere für ein Kraftfahrzeug, und hierfür ausgelegter, tragbarer Transponder

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle d'accès commandé à distance, en particulier pour un véhicule à moteur et transpondeur portable associé

Publication

EP 1006248 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98123009 A

Priority

EP 98123009 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a stationary transmitter and receiver device which transmits a polling code signal, receives a code signal from a portable transponder and delivers an unlocking signal to an unlocking unit if the code signal coincides with an internal code signal. The transponder has a manually operated actuation element which causes the transponder to transmit a code signal with information indicating whether the code signal is a response to a received polling signal or to operation of the manual control element. The transmitter/receiver device takes this information into account when deciding to generate an unlocking signal.

Abstract (de)

Der tragbare Transponder (1) erzeugt als Reaktion auf den Empfang eines von der stationären Sende- und Empfangseinrichtung (6) zugeführten Fragecodesignals ein anderes Antwort-Codesignal und/oder eine andere, diesem hinzugeführte Information als bei Betätigung eines Transponder-Betätigungselements (3). Die stationäre Sende- und Empfangseinrichtung vergleicht das empfangene Codesignal und/oder die hinzugefügte Information mit einem Sollcodesignal und/oder einer Information, die abhängig davon, ob zuvor ein Fragecodesignal ausgesendet worden ist, unterschiedlich sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00309 (2013.01); G07C 9/00182 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00365 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00793 (2013.01); G07C 2209/63 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4329697 A1 19950309 - SIEMENS AG [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006248 A1 20000607; EP 1006248 B1 20031022; DE 59809979 D1 20031127; US 6577227 B1 20030610

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151231

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091204

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20091204

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59809979

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI