Global Patent Index - EP 1006255 A1

EP 1006255 A1 2000-06-07 - End cap and mounting support combination

Title (en)

End cap and mounting support combination

Title (de)

Kombinierte Endkappe und Halterung

Title (fr)

Embout et Support combiné

Publication

EP 1006255 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99309695 A

Priority

  • EP 99309695 A
  • EP 98204081 A

Abstract (en)

End cap and mounting support combination comprising an end cap (11, 111, 211, 311, 411) disengagably engagable with a support bracket (3) and one of the end cap and the support bracket being provided with: a laterally open slot (20, 120, 220, 320, 420) for accommodating an axially extending protuberance (21) on the other of the end cap and the support bracket; and closing means to prevent the protuberance from escaping from the laterally open slot; wherein the closing means comprises a rotatable locking collar (19, 119, 219, 319, 419) surrounding the laterally open slot and having a circumferential entrance opening (23, 123, 223, 323, 423) which can be aligned with the laterally open slot by rotation of the locking collar relative to the laterally open slot from a closed position to an open position, thereby selectively providing access to the laterally open slot through the circumferential entrance opening. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/50; E06B 9/174

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/174 (2006.01); E06B 9/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/50 (2013.01); E06B 9/174 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

[A] US 5450891 A 19950919 - BENTHIN SIEGFRIED [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006255 A1 20000607; EP 1006255 B1 20031022

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161129

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161212

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69912224 P 20031127

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WELFONDER, KONRAD

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI