Global Patent Index - EP 1006257 A3

EP 1006257 A3 2000-09-13 - A drag-type Rotary Drill Bit

Title (en)

A drag-type Rotary Drill Bit

Title (de)

Drehbohr-Fräsmeissel

Title (fr)

Trépan racleur rotatif

Publication

EP 1006257 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99309665 A

Priority

  • US 11085398 P
  • US 44705999 A
  • US 44407299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1006257A2] There is provided a rotary drag-type drill bit comprising a bit body (8) having a leading surface (10) comprising a plurality of pads (11), at least some of the pads (11) each having a wearable abrasive surface including particles of superhard material and defining an outer profile of the pad, at least a part of the outer profile of at least one of the pads (11) being disposed inwardly or outwardly of the outer profile of the other pads (11). With this arrangement, during initial drilling through softer formation, most of the removal of formation will be effected by the outermost of the abrasive pads (11) and little or no formation will be removed by the more inward pads (11). Accordingly, the bit will act as a lighter set bit and good rates of penetration may be achieved. As drilling proceeds and the bit wears, which may occur more rapidly as the bit meets harder formations, the more outwardly disposed pads (11) will wear down more than the inwardly disposed pads (11) so that the inwardly disposed pads (11) will begin to contribute more to the cutting action of the bit, so that the bit effectively becomes heavier set. As drilling progresses to a point where all of the pads (11) wear down to the same level, the bit will then act as a conventional heavy set bit where all the abrasive surfaces lie on the same profile. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 10/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/42 (2006.01); E21B 10/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/54 (2013.01); E21B 10/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006257 A2 20000607; EP 1006257 A3 20000913; EP 1006257 B1 20040225; DE 69915009 D1 20040401; DE 69915009 T2 20041230

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CAMCO INTERNATIONAL (UK) LTD

- Effective date: 20041231

2005-12-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-07-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041201

2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CAMCO INTERNATIONAL (UK) LTD

- Effective date: 20041231

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69915009 P 20040401

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2004-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CAMCO INTERNATIONAL (UK) LTD.

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021212

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI