Global Patent Index - EP 1006262 A1

EP 1006262 A1 2000-06-07 - Cooling method and apparatus for rotor vanes of a thermodynamic engine

Title (en)

Cooling method and apparatus for rotor vanes of a thermodynamic engine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Kühlung einer Laufschaufel innerhalb einer Wärmekraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif de refroidissement des aubes de rotor d'une machine thermodynamique

Publication

EP 1006262 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811183 A

Priority

EP 98811183 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a hollow channel (5) passing through the foot (4) of a runner blade that is attached to a rotor shaft (6) to rotate about a rotation axis (7). The hollow channel has an inlet opening (9) and an outlet opening (10) for cooling air at different distances from the rotation axis and arranged on the same side of the blade foot. An Independent claim is also included for a method of cooling a runner blade in a heat engine.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird Vorrichtung sowie ein Verfahren zur Kühlung einer Laufschaufel innerhalb einer Wärmekraftmaschine, vorzugsweise einer Gasturbine, mit einem Schaufelfuß, der mit einer Rotorwelle verbunden ist und um eine Rotationsachse rotiert. Die Erfindung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß im Bereich des Schaufelfusses ein, den Schaufelfuß durchsetzender Hohlkanal mit einer Ein- und einer Auslaßöffnung vorgesehen ist, dessen Ein- und Auslaßöffnung unterschiedliche Abstände zur Rotationsachse aufweisen und auf der gleichen Seite des Schaufelfusses angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/18; F01D 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/08 (2006.01); F01D 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/081 (2013.01); F01D 5/187 (2013.01); F05D 2260/205 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006262 A1 20000607; EP 1006262 B1 20030910; DE 59809582 D1 20031016

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59809582

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59809582

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-02-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040104

2004-01-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809582 P 20031016

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB (SCHWEIZ) AG

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001027

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI