Global patent index - EP 1006264 A2

EP 1006264 A2 2000-06-07 - Coolable shroud for a turbomachine

Title (en)

Coolable shroud for a turbomachine

Title (de)

Kühlbarer Mantel für eine Turbomaschine

Title (fr)

Virole refroidissable pour turbomachine

Publication

EP 1006264 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99811095 A

Priority

  • DE 19855130 A
  • US 45072899 A

Abstract (en)

The ring-shaped jacket has an air guide chamber formed between curved jacket segments and guide segments. The guide segments (30) are positioned loose with radial play. They are guided between a carrier segment (20) and distance pieces (12). These are fastened to the back of the jacket segments to project in radial direction. The guide segments have U-shaped radial webs (32) held with small axial play in guide grooves (22) of the carrier segment.

Abstract (de)

Kühlbarer Mantel einer Gasturbine oder dergleichen, mit mehreren bogenförmigen Mantelsegmenten (10), die in Umfangsrichtung aneinandergrenzend zu einem im Wesentlichen geschlossenen, ein Laufrad (110), insbesondere einer Hochdruckturbine, umgebenden Mantelring angeordnet sind, wenigstens einer ringförmigen Mantelkühlkammer (15), die in radialer Richtung zwischen den Mantelsegmenten (10) und bogenförmigen, mit einer Vielzahl von Durchgangsöffnungen (34) versehenen Leitsegmenten (30) gebildet ist, wenigstens einer Luftführungskammer (25), die in radialer Richtung zwischen den Leitsegmenten (30) und wenigstens einem Trägersegment (20) gebildet ist, sowie wenigstens einem, an dem Trägersegment (20) angebrachten Luftzuführungskanal (26), der in die Luftführungskammer (25) mündet, wobei die Leitsegmente (30) lose mit radialem Spiel gelagert sind. Hierdurch wird eine spannungsfreie Aufnahme auch im Falle intensiver Vorgänge mit hohen Temperaturgradienten gewährleistet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 11/24; F01D 11/08; F01D 25/12; F01D 25/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/08 (2006.01); F01D 11/24 (2006.01); F01D 25/14 (2006.01); F01D 25/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/08 (2013.01); F01D 11/24 (2013.01); F01D 25/246 (2013.01); F05D 2260/201 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0516322 B1 19951108 - GEN ELECTRIC [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19855130 A1 20000531; EP 1006264 A2 20000607; EP 1006264 A3 20031022; EP 1006264 B1 20050105; JP 2000192802 A 20000711; JP 4489882 B2 20100623; US 6322320 B1 20011127

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59911401

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59911401

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-01-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-05-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59911401

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-02-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-02-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2005-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2005-01-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2004-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040413

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 01D 11/24 A

2003-10-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 01D 11/08 B

2003-10-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 01D 25/12 B

2003-10-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 01D 25/24 B

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI