Global patent index - EP 1006269 A2

EP 1006269 A2 2000-06-07 - Control apparatus for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Control apparatus for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Steuervorrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1006269 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99123306 A

Priority

JP 33910998 A

Abstract (en)

Fuel injection amount correcting means (21) for correcting a fuel injection amount in accordance with a change in engine load caused by activation or deactivation of an exhaust throttle valve (100) is provided. Fluctuations of engine rotational speed at the time of deactivation of the exhaust throttle valve (100) are detected, and the timing for fuel correction performed by the fuel injection amount correcting means (21) is changed based on the detected fluctuations of engine rotational speed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 9/06; F02D 33/02; F02D 41/12; F02D 41/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/04 (2006.01); F02D 9/06 (2006.01); F02D 31/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/24 (2006.01); F02D 41/40 (2006.01); F02D 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 31/007 (2013.01); F02D 9/06 (2013.01); F02D 41/2451 (2013.01); F02D 41/2441 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006269 A2 20000607; EP 1006269 A3 20011031; EP 1006269 B1 20050112; DE 69923151 D1 20050217; DE 69923151 T2 20060105; JP 2000161116 A 20000613; JP 3414286 B2 20030609

INPADOC legal status

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131122

2014-09-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69923151

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20131122

2013-10-24 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 69923151

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130829

2013-09-18 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20130827

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121114

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-01-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-10-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69923151

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-02-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-01-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991123

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI