Global Patent Index - EP 1006270 A1

EP 1006270 A1 2000-06-07 - Control method of the purging of nitrogen oxides in a catalytic converter for exhaust gases of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Control method of the purging of nitrogen oxides in a catalytic converter for exhaust gases of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Steuerverfahren zum entfernen von Stickstoffoxide von einem Abgaskataslysator eines Verbrennungsmotors

Title (fr)

Procédé de commande de purge en oxydes d'azote d'un pot catalytique de traitement des gaz d'échappement d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1006270 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402945 A

Priority

FR 9815226 A

Abstract (en)

While the purge is being stopped in a process to purge nitrogen oxides from an engine exhaust, the air/fuel richness ratio is brought to a level (R2) between initial value R0 and purge value R1 and the angle is changed to a third set value ( alpha 3) before being increased to a fourth value ( alpha 4) as the air flow increases. The three variables are returned to their initial values (R0, D0, alpha 0) In a process to purge nitrogen oxides (NOx) from an internal combustion engine exhaust, a catalytic pot adsorbs the nitrous oxides when the motor operates with a fuel/air mixture poor in fuel. The purge is controlled by the temporary increase in richness of the fuel/air mixture by progressively reducing the air flow (D) into the engine so as to optimize the fuel consumption at the set richness. The angle of spark ( alpha ) is abruptly reduced to a set value ( alpha 1) to maintain the torque generated by the engine. The angle is then increased to a second value ( alpha 2) optimizing the fuel consumption of the engine as a function of the richness (R1) and the air flow (D1) fixed during the purge. The purge is stopped by returning the values of the richness (R), the air flow and the angle to their initial values. The intermediate value R1 matches a stoichiometric air/fuel ratio. While the purge is being stopped, the air/fuel richness ratio is brought to a level (R2) between initial value R0 and purge value R1 and the angle is changed to a third set value ( alpha 3) before being increased to a fourth value ( alpha 4) as the air flow increases. The three variables are returned to their initial values (R0, D0, alpha 0). The purge is started and stopped under the control of a system which measures the NOx load in the catalytic pot.

Abstract (fr)

On déclenche une purge du pot en commandant un accroissement de la richesse (R) en carburant du mélange. Suivant ce procédé, a) à l'instant (t1) de l'accroissement de richesse, on réduit le débit d'air (D) entrant dans le moteur, et on réduit brusquement l'angle () d'avance à l'allumage du mélange air/carburant à une valeur (1), et b) on arrête la purge en abaissant d'abord la richesse à une valeur (R2), avec remontée progressive du débit d'air (D) et remontée brusque de l'angle () à une valeur (3), en asservissant ensuite une décroissance de l'angle () jusqu'à la valeur (4) et en rétablissant enfin la richesse (R), le débit (D) et l'angle () aux valeurs (R0,D0,0) antérieures à la purge. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/02; F02D 37/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 37/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F01N 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/0842 (2013.01); F02D 37/02 (2013.01); F02D 41/0275 (2013.01); F02D 2250/21 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006270 A1 20000607; EP 1006270 B1 20030312; DE 69905841 D1 20030417; DE 69905841 T2 20031120; FR 2786814 A1 20000609; FR 2786814 B1 20010209

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69905841

- Effective date: 20120601

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69905841 P 20030417

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S.

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI