Global Patent Index - EP 1006282 A3

EP 1006282 A3 2000-09-27 - Selfpriming motorpump assembly

Title (en)

Selfpriming motorpump assembly

Title (de)

Selbstansaugendes Motorpumpenaggregat

Title (fr)

Ensemble motopompe autoamorçante

Publication

EP 1006282 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99117744 A

Priority

DE 19855845 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1006282A2] The system has an electric drive motor (2) driving a pump (5) with at least one rotor wheel (5A) mounted on the motor shaft and a housing with a suction port (3) and a pressure port (4) with a feed path (7-9) between them. The ports are each arranged in an end section, are mutually coaxial and parallel to the motor shaft (W). An Independent claim is also included for an application of the system as a rainwater pump.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 13/06; F04D 9/02; F04D 9/06; F04D 15/00; F04D 29/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 11/00 (2006.01); F04D 15/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/406 (2013.01); F04B 11/00 (2013.01); F04D 15/0083 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006282 A2 20000607; EP 1006282 A3 20000927; DE 19855845 A1 20000608

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-11-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17D

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 04D 13/06 A, 7F 04D 15/00 B, 7F 04D 29/40 B, 7F 04D 9/02 B, 7F 04D 9/06 B

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI