Global Patent Index - EP 1006311 A2

EP 1006311 A2 2000-06-07 - Lamp of the type of a signal and/or orientation lamp

Title (en)

Lamp of the type of a signal and/or orientation lamp

Title (de)

Leuchte nach Art einer Signal- und/oder Orientierungsleuchte

Title (fr)

Lampe du type lampe de signalisation et/ou d'orientation

Publication

EP 1006311 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123491 A

Priority

DE 19855624 A

Abstract (en)

The signal or orienting light (10) has at least one LED (17) arranged inside a light housing (11). At least one lens element (20) is arranged in the beam course of the LED. The signal or orienting light provides a type of light point as an aid to the orientation. The signal or orienting light is connected with a control system and is controlled by this. The LED (17,fig.2) is mounted on board (18) in the housing (11).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Signal- bzw. Orientierungsleuchte (10) zur Anbringung in oder an einer Gebäudefläche oder an eine Gebäudeteilfläche, wobei die Signal- bzw. Orientierungsleuchte (10) zur Bildung eines Personenleitsystems mit anderen Signal- oder Orientierungsleuchten (10) zusammengefaßt ist. Die Besonderheit besteht darin, daß innerhalb eines Leuchtengehäuses (11) mindestens eine LED (17) angeordnet ist, daß wenigstens ein Linsenelement (20) im Strahlengang der LED (17) angeordnet ist, daß die Signal- bzw. Orientierungsleuchte (10) eine Art Lichtpunkt als Orientierungshilfe im Raum bereitstellt, und daß die Signal- bzw. Orientierungsleuchte (10) mit einem Steuerungssystem verbunden und von diesem ansteuerbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/06 (2006.01); F21K 99/00 (2010.01); F21S 2/00 (2006.01); F21S 4/00 (2006.01); F21S 8/02 (2006.01); F21V 5/00 (2006.01); F21V 5/04 (2006.01); F21V 9/08 (2006.01); F21V 13/04 (2006.01); F21V 23/04 (2006.01); F21V 31/00 (2006.01); F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 3/02 (2006.01); F21V 3/04 (2006.01); F21V 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 31/00 (2013.01); E01F 9/559 (2016.02); F21S 2/00 (2013.01); F21S 4/28 (2016.01); F21S 8/022 (2013.01); F21S 8/024 (2013.01); F21S 8/032 (2013.01); F21V 5/00 (2013.01); F21V 5/04 (2013.01); F21V 9/08 (2013.01); F21V 13/04 (2013.01); F21V 23/04 (2013.01); F21S 9/022 (2013.01); F21S 48/215 (2013.01); F21V 3/02 (2013.01); F21V 3/04 (2013.01); F21V 21/04 (2013.01); F21W 2111/00 (2013.01); F21W 2111/02 (2013.01); F21W 2111/027 (2013.01); F21Y 2115/10 (2016.08)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29921156 U1 20000420; DE 19956799 A1 20000615; EP 1006311 A2 20000607; EP 1006311 A3 20011004

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120329

2009-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ERCO GMBH

2002-06-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011113

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21S 8/00 A, 7F 21K 7/00 B, 7G 08B 5/36 B, 7F 21W 111:00 Z, 7F 21Y 101:00 Z

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI