Global Patent Index - EP 1006317 A1

EP 1006317 A1 2000-06-07 - Boiler for fireplace

Title (en)

Boiler for fireplace

Title (de)

Kaminheizkessel

Title (fr)

Dispositif de chaudière d'atre

Publication

EP 1006317 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98440276 A

Priority

EP 98440276 A

Abstract (en)

The boiler comprises a head (1), the two opposite walls of which are doubled to form two water reservoirs. The reservoirs are connected together by spaced tubes (20,30) which extend above the fire. The double walls are connected to a water circuit, one comprising a water inlet (13) and the other the water outlet (14,15).

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif de chaudière d'âtre. Celui-ci est caractérisé en ce qu'il comporte un avaloir (1) dont deux parois en vis-à-vis sont doubles pour former deux réservoirs destinés à être remplis d'eau, et reliées entre elles par des tubes espacés (20, 30) s'étendant au-dessus du foyer, lesdites parois doubles étant connectées à un circuit d'eau, l'une comportant une arrivée d'eau (13) et l'autre une sortie (14, 15). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24B 1/183

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24B 1/183 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24B 1/183 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006317 A1 20000607

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031203

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI